プロの翻訳者、企業、ウェブページから自由に利用できる翻訳レポジトリまで。
19 kasım 1939 günü vvs komutanlığının adı kızıl ordu hava kuvvetleri ana direktörlüğü olarak değiştirildi.
on 19 november 1939, vvs headquarters was again titled the main directorate of the red army air forces under the wpra hq.
最終更新: 2016-03-03
使用頻度: 1
品質:
temmuz 2010 ve temmuz 2011 arasında arjantin milli futbol takımı teknik direktörlüğü yapmıştır.
he was head coach of argentina national football team from july 2010 to july 2011.
最終更新: 2016-03-03
使用頻度: 1
品質:
2 ocak 2015 günü kulüp tarafından yapılan açıklamaya göre, roberto carlos akhisar belediyespor teknik direktörlüğü görevine getirildi.
===akhisar belediyespor===on 2 january 2015 roberto carlos was appointed as manager of akhisar belediyespor.
最終更新: 2016-03-03
使用頻度: 1
品質:
başarılı bir a1gp sezonundan sonra, maktum, 29 eylül 2006'da a1gp direktörlüğü pozisyonunu satacağını açıkladı.
after a successful first season of a1gp, it was announced on 29 september 2006 that maktoum was to sell his position as chairman & director of a1gp.
最終更新: 2016-03-03
使用頻度: 1
品質:
警告:見えない HTML フォーマットが含まれています
projeye ilişkin aile ve sosyal politika bakanlığı, İsveç krallığı büyükelçiliği ve dünya bankası türkiye Ülke direktörlüğü arasında mutabakat zaptı imzalanmıştır.
a memorandum of understanding has been signed for the project by ministry of family and social policy, embassy of the kingdom of sweden and the world bank turkey country director’s office.
最終更新: 2017-04-27
使用頻度: 1
品質:
daha sonra 28 mart 1924'te sscb hava kuvvetleri direktörlüğü ve 1 ocak 1925'te İşçilerin ve köylülerin kızıl ordusu hava kuvvetleri ismini aldı.
it became the directorate of the ussr air forces on 28 march 1924, and then the directorate of the workers-peasants red army air forces on 1 january 1925.
最終更新: 2016-03-03
使用頻度: 1
品質:
yürütülecek tüm tasarım ve değişiklik yönetimi süreçlerine sağlık, emniyet ve Çevre direktörlüğü dahil edilir ve ileriye dönük detay teknik yöntemlerde İş güvenliğinin etkin yönetimi için gerekli detay ve aşamalar planlanır.
health, safety and environment directorate shall be included in all design and change management processes to be executed and required details and phases for effective management of occupational safety shall be planned in prospective detail technical methods.
2000-2004 yılları arasında yürüttüğü çevre direktörlüğü görevinde, bankanın ilk çevre stratejisinin hazırlanmasına başkanlık etti ve çevre alanında verilen kredilerle ilgili 11 milyar doların üzerindeki bir portföyü yönetti.
as director for environment from 2000-2004, she led the preparation of the bank's first environmental strategy and oversaw a portfolio of over $11 billion in environmental lending.
bu kolonistlerin geliştirdiği uygarlıklar eve online'daki beş ana ihlitafı oluşturmaktadır: amarr İmparatorluğu, caldari devleti, gallente federasyonu, minmatar cumhuriyeti ve jove direktörlüğü.
the states based around these colonies make up the five major factions in "eve online": the amarr empire, the caldari state, the gallente federation, the minmatar republic and the jove directorate.
== genel bakış ==casusluk görevlerini rusya federasyonu dış İstihbarat servisi (eski kgb sscb birinci baş direktörlüğü) üzerine aldığı için fsb daha çok iç işler ile ilgilenir.
the two major structural components of the former kgb that remain administratively independent of the fsb are the foreign intelligence service (svr) and the state guards (fso).
saha faaliyetlerinde yer alacak tüm tedarikçi ve alt-yükleniciler iş başlamadan önce “seÇ Ön-değerlendirmesine” tabi tutulurlar ve seÇ direktörlüğünün onayı ile gerekli iş güvenliği önlemlerini ve kaynakları sağlayarak iş başı yaparlar.
all suppliers and sub-contractors to be employed in site operations shall be subjected to "hse preliminary evaluation" prior to commencing the work and they start to work by providing occupational safety measures and resources with the approval of hse directorate.