来自专业的译者、企业、网页和免费的翻译库。
mr sten frimodt nielsen
sten frimodt nielsen
最后更新: 2014-11-21
使用频率: 1
质量:
mr sten frimodt nielsen (denmark)
monsieur sten frimodt nielsen (danemark)
最后更新: 2017-04-26
使用频率: 1
质量:
frimodt nielsen delivered in open court in luxembourg on 9 september 2008.
frimodt nielsen ainsi prononcé en audience publique à luxembourg, le 9 septembre 2008.
最后更新: 2015-05-14
使用频率: 1
质量:
pedersen frimodt, r. a/s / commission of the ec : 301/86 ord.87p.3123
pedersen frimodt, r. a/s / commission des ce : 301/86 ord.87p.3123
最后更新: 2014-02-06
使用频率: 1
质量:
mr sten frimodt nielsen is hereby appointed judge to the court of first instance of the european communities for the period from 17 september 2007 to 31 august 2010.
sten frimodt nielsen est nommé juge du tribunal de première instance des communautés européennes pour la période allant du 17 septembre 2007 jusqu'au 31 août 2010.
最后更新: 2014-11-21
使用频率: 1
质量:
in september 2007 mr b. vesterdorf, a member of the court of first instance since it was created in 1989 and its president for more than 10 years, left office and was replaced as judge by mr s. frimodt nielsen.
au mois de septembre 2007, m. le président b. vesterdorf, qui était membre du tribunal depuis sa création en 1989 et président depuis près de dix ans, a quitté ses fonctions et a été remplacé par m. s. frimodt nielsen.
最后更新: 2015-05-14
使用频率: 1
质量:
by decisions of 25 april 2007 and 23 may 2007, mr alfred dittrich, mr santiago soldevila fragoso and mr laurent truchot were appointed as judges for the period from 1 september 2007 to 31 august 2013, respectively replacing mr jörg pirrung, mr rafael garcía-valdecasas y fernández and mr hubert legal, while mr sten frimodt nielsen was appointed as a judge for the period from 17 september 2007 to 31 august 2010, replacing mr bo vesterdorf.
ont été nommés en qualité de juges, par décisions du 25 avril 2007 et du 23 mai 2007, pour la période du 1er septembre 2007 au 31 août 2013, m. alfred dittrich, en remplacement de m. jörg pirrung, m. santiago soldevila fragoso, en remplacement de m. rafael garcía-valdecasas y fernández, m. laurent truchot, en remplacement de m. hubert legal et, pour la période du 17 septembre 2007 au 31 août 2010, m. sten frimodt nielsen, en remplacement de m. bo vesterdorf.
最后更新: 2015-05-14
使用频率: 1
质量: