Tentando aprender a traduzir a partir dos exemplos de tradução humana.
A partir de tradutores profissionais, empresas, páginas da web e repositórios de traduções disponíveis gratuitamente
miro prek
mr miro prek
Última atualização: 2014-11-21
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
miro prek (slovinsko)
mr miro prek (slovenia)
Última atualização: 2017-04-26
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
predseda: pán miro (sk.
president: mr mira (gr.
Última atualização: 2017-04-06
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
pán miro prek bol navrhnutý na opätovné vymenovanie do funkcie sudcu všeobecného súdu.
it has been proposed that the term of office of mr miro prek as judge of the general court be renewed.
Última atualização: 2014-11-21
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
v ten istý deň ich nahradili v uvedenom poradí páni nils wahl, enzo moavero milanesi a miro prek.
on the same day they were replaced by mr nils wahl, mr enzo moavero milanesi and mr miro prek respectively.
Última atualização: 2014-02-06
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
miro prek sa vymenúva za sudcu súdu prvého stupňa európskych spoločenstiev s platnosťou odo dňa zloženia sľubu do 31. augusta 2007.
mr miro prek is hereby appointed judge to the court of first instance of the european communities from the date of his swearing-in until 31 august 2007.
Última atualização: 2014-11-21
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
pri príležitosti čiastočnej obmeny členov súdneho dvora a v nadväznosti na menovanie dvoch sudcov súdu prvého stupňa za členov súdneho dvora boli za sudcov súdu prvého stupňa európskych spoločenstiev menovaní pán nils wahl namiesto pani pernilla lindh a pán miro prek namiesto pani verica trstenjak.
born 1954; doctor of laws (la sapienza university, rome); studies in community law (college of europe, bruges); member of the bar, legal practice (1978–83); lecturer in community law at the universities of la sapienza (rome) (1993–96), luiss (rome) (1993–96 and 2002–06) and bocconi (milan) (1996–2000); advisor on community matters to the italian prime minister (1993–95); ocial at the european commission: legal adviser and subsequently head of cabinet of the vice-president (1989–92), head of cabinet of the commissioner responsible for the internal market (1995–99) and competition (1999), director, directorate-general for competition (2000–02), deputy secretary-general of the european commission (2002–05), director-general of the bureau of european policy advisers (2006); judge at the court of first instance since 3 may 2006.
Última atualização: 2014-02-06
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade:
aj bavorské podniky miro, bayernoil a igs, ktoré nie sú účastníkmi projektu, sa vyjadrili kladne, najmä čo sa týka významu projektu pre budúcnosť petrochemického priemyslu v bavorsku.
even the bavarian companies not participating directly in the project (miro, bayernoil and igs) took a positive view, especially given the impact of the project on the future of the petrochemical industry in bavaria.
Última atualização: 2014-10-19
Frequência de uso: 1
Qualidade: