Att försöka lära sig översätta från mänskliga översättningsexempel.
Från professionella översättare, företag, webbsidor och fritt tillgängliga översättningsdatabaser.
otmar karas, mep
otmar karas, diputado al parlamento europeo
Senast uppdaterad: 2017-04-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing, executive board;
otmar issing, comité ejecutivo;
Senast uppdaterad: 2012-03-19
Användningsfrekvens: 3
Kvalitet:
otmar kloiber (for the rapporteur)
dr. otmar kloiber (por el ponente)
Senast uppdaterad: 2017-04-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing 1 jun 1998 - 31 may 2006
otmar issing 1 jun. 1998 - 31 mayo 2006
Senast uppdaterad: 2011-10-23
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing 1 jun. 1998 - 31 mayo 2006
otmar issing 1 jun 1998 - 31 may 2006
Senast uppdaterad: 2011-10-23
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing (board member until may 2006)
otmar issing (miembro del comité ejecutivo hasta mayo del 2006)
Senast uppdaterad: 2014-02-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
mr otmar haslerhead of the government and minister for finance
d. otmar haslerpresidente del gobierno y ministro de hacienda
Senast uppdaterad: 2017-04-26
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
mr otmar issingmember of the executive board of the european central bank
d. otmar issingmiembro del comité ejecutivo del banco central europeo
Senast uppdaterad: 2017-04-26
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
his excellency mr. otmar hasler, prime minister of the principality of liechtenstein
excelentísimo señor otmar hasler, primer ministro del principado de liechtenstein
Senast uppdaterad: 2016-11-30
Användningsfrekvens: 2
Kvalitet:
outgoing executive board member otmar issing greeting his successor jürgen stark on 29 may 2006
29 de mayo de 2006: otmar issing, miembro del comité ejecutivo, saluda a su sucesor jürgen stara
Senast uppdaterad: 2012-03-19
Användningsfrekvens: 3
Kvalitet:
based on a presentation by otmar issing to the european parliament’s economic and monetaryaffairs committee
“la puesta en marcha de las reformasestructurales en la zona euro debe hacersecon prontitud”, concluyó.
Senast uppdaterad: 2014-02-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
back row : tommaso padoa-schioppa , otmar issing , eugenio domingo-solans
fila posterior : tommaso padoa-schioppa , otmar issing y eugenio domingo solans
Senast uppdaterad: 2011-10-23
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing as member of the executive board of the european central bank for a term of office of eight years.
otmar issing como miembro del comité ejecutivo del banco central europeo por un período de ocho anos.
Senast uppdaterad: 2012-03-19
Användningsfrekvens: 3
Kvalitet:
the assembly will now hear a statement by his excellency mr. otmar hasler, prime minister of the principality of liechtenstein.
ahora escucharemos una declaración del sr. otmar hasler, primer ministro del principado de liechtenstein.
Senast uppdaterad: 2016-11-29
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
back row (left to right):eugenio domingo solans, tommaso padoa-schioppa, otmar issing
fila posterior (de izquierda a derecha) eugenio domingo solans,tommaso padoa-schioppa,otmar issing
Senast uppdaterad: 2014-02-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
executive board member otmar issing giving a farewell speech at the end of his eight-year term of office on 29 may 2006.
29 de mayo de 2006: otmar issing, miembro del comité ejecutivo, pronuncia un discurso de despedida al término de sus ocho años de mandato
Senast uppdaterad: 2012-03-19
Användningsfrekvens: 3
Kvalitet:
back row ( left to right ) : eugenio domingo solans , tommaso padoa-schioppa , otmar issing
fila posterior ( de izquierda a derecha ) : eugenio domingo solans , tommaso padoa-schioppa y otmar issing .
Senast uppdaterad: 2011-10-23
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
back row(leftto right):josé manuel gonzález-páramo,tommaso padoa-schioppa, otmar issing
fila posterior (de izquierda de derecha):josé manuel gonzález-páramo,tommaso padoa-schioppa,otmar issing
Senast uppdaterad: 2014-02-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
from left to right : sieglinde issing , otmar issing , jean-claude trichet and jürgen stark at the farewell event on 29 may 2006
29 de mayo de 2006 , de izquierda a derecha : sieglinde issing , otmar issing , jean-claude trichet y jürgen stark en la ceremonia de despedida
Senast uppdaterad: 2011-10-23
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet:
otmar issing member of the executive board of the ecbtommaso padoa-schioppa member of the executive board of the ecbgertrude tumpel-gugerell member of the executive board of the ecb
jean-claude trichet presidente del bcelucas d. papademos vicepresidente del bceeugenio domingo solans(hasta el 31 de mayo de 2004) miembro del comité ejecutivo del bce
Senast uppdaterad: 2014-02-06
Användningsfrekvens: 1
Kvalitet: